Notifications

loading...

LEVEL 0

Leaderboard Rank

0

points

0

Achievements:

Information

Feedback

Feedback Message |

Session Has Expired!

Notifications

loading...

LEVEL 0

Leaderboard Rank

0

points

0

Achievements:

Dialog content here.

An Email has been sent with your login details

Verify your Email and Mobile number

---------------------------- OR ----------------------------

3-Day Free Trial

Thank you for verifying mobile number.

You may take free trial by filling the details below.

You may take free trial by filling the details below.

Voice Your Opinion!!

Dear Topper Learning User,

It is our constant endeavour to better your Topper Learning experience. We'd be delighted if you could spare a few minutes to help us in this pursuit by answering a short survey. Appreciate your participation and constant support.

Read

Learning to perform fast mental maths calculation will help you immensely irrespective of which field of life you deal with.Knowing these mental maths tricks will give you a positive edge over the others.Whether you are a student,aspiring engineer,statistician,scientist,school teacher or anyone else dealing with numbers,learning this quick mental tricks and techniques

(popularly known as Vedic Maths techniques) is always going to benefit you.

You must have heard of Shakuntala Devi-the lady who performed maths calculations faster than a Computer,you can do it too, just with a little bit of practice.

For example, let say you want to multiply 52*11.This can be calculated in less than 1 second but if you want to do it traditionally,it will take you around 5-6 seconds.Isn't it?

**So let see how using a simple mental maths trick,this calculation can be done in a matter of seconds...**

To multiply 52 and 11,imagine there is a space between 52

52*11= 5_2 (Put an imaginary space in between)

Now,what to do with that space?

Just add 5 and 2 and put the result in the imaginary space

So, 52 * 11 =572 (which is your answer)

Isn't it great?

**Lets try some more examples:**

1) 35 * 11 = 3 (3+5) 5 = 385

2) 81 * 11 = 8 (8+1) 1 = 891

3) 72 * 11 = 7 (7+2) 2 = 792 etc..

With just a little bit of practice you can easily perform these simple mental maths tricks in the blink of an eye.

People sitting for competitive exams often complain that they could not complete the Question paper within a certain time period as the paper was too length(l)y.But for your information,let me tell you that all papers of all competitive exams are so designed that students can finish it within the given time period.Its just that student do not have the required efficiency.So in tight time constraint situation where time plays a very important role,knowing these quick mental maths techniques will give you an edge over your competitors.It will be your X-Factor.It will give you that sharpness and smartness required to crack any competitive exams.

Lets take an example of this sum which has been taken from the 2010 question paper of a Popular Bank PO Examination (Aptitude Section):

Is 456138 divisible by 9?

Now, it only takes 2 seconds for you to determine the answer.But if you go by the traditional way then it will take you 10 seconds.So you can see the difference.Those 8 extra seconds you win,you can spend on other question.Isn't it?

Now let see the solution

To test whether a certain large number is divisible by 9 or not,'just add all the digits of the number and if the end result is divisible by 9,then you can say that the entire large number will be divisible by 9 too'.

4+5+6+1+3+8=27

Now since 27 is divisible by 9 so 456138 will be divisible by 9 too.

By now you must have some idea, how important it is to know these mental maths tricks.Knowing these simple calculation techniques gives you an advantage over others and can get you a job,get you crack any competitive exams and much more.

**Here are few more mental maths tricks..**

Multiply any large number by 12 mentally in seconds

To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour

For example 21314 * 12 = 255768

Lets break it into simple steps:

Step 1: 021314 * 12 = _____8 (Double of Last Digit 4= 8 )

Step 2: 021314 * 12 = ____68 (Now Double 1= 2, and add it to 4, 2+4=6)

Step 3: 021314 * 12= ___768 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 1, 6+1=7)

Step 4: 021314 * 12= __5768 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 2+3=5)

Step 5: 021314 * 12= _55768 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 1, 4+1=5)

Step 6: 021314 * 12= 255768 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 2, 0+2=2)

So your final answer of 21314 * 12 = 255768

Another example...

Calculating Square of numbers quickly...

Lets calculate the square of 54

So (54)^2 = 5^2 +4 -- 4^2 = 25 +4 ----16 =29-------16= 2916

Similarly (55)^2 = 5^2 +5 --5^2=25+5------25=30---------25= 3025

Similarly (56)^2 = 5^2 + 6--6^2=25+6------36= 31--------36= 3136 etc..

Similarly try out squares of 57,58 etc..

These are just few of the many Mental Maths Tricks possible. For more Mental Math tricks keep reading this section on regular basis.

(popularly known as Vedic Maths techniques) is always going to benefit you.

You must have heard of Shakuntala Devi-the lady who performed maths calculations faster than a Computer,you can do it too, just with a little bit of practice.

For example, let say you want to multiply 52*11.This can be calculated in less than 1 second but if you want to do it traditionally,it will take you around 5-6 seconds.Isn't it?

To multiply 52 and 11,imagine there is a space between 52

52*11= 5_2 (Put an imaginary space in between)

Now,what to do with that space?

Just add 5 and 2 and put the result in the imaginary space

So, 52 * 11 =572 (which is your answer)

Isn't it great?

1) 35 * 11 = 3 (3+5) 5 = 385

2) 81 * 11 = 8 (8+1) 1 = 891

3) 72 * 11 = 7 (7+2) 2 = 792 etc..

With just a little bit of practice you can easily perform these simple mental maths tricks in the blink of an eye.

People sitting for competitive exams often complain that they could not complete the Question paper within a certain time period as the paper was too length(l)y.But for your information,let me tell you that all papers of all competitive exams are so designed that students can finish it within the given time period.Its just that student do not have the required efficiency.So in tight time constraint situation where time plays a very important role,knowing these quick mental maths techniques will give you an edge over your competitors.It will be your X-Factor.It will give you that sharpness and smartness required to crack any competitive exams.

Lets take an example of this sum which has been taken from the 2010 question paper of a Popular Bank PO Examination (Aptitude Section):

Is 456138 divisible by 9?

Now, it only takes 2 seconds for you to determine the answer.But if you go by the traditional way then it will take you 10 seconds.So you can see the difference.Those 8 extra seconds you win,you can spend on other question.Isn't it?

Now let see the solution

To test whether a certain large number is divisible by 9 or not,'just add all the digits of the number and if the end result is divisible by 9,then you can say that the entire large number will be divisible by 9 too'.

4+5+6+1+3+8=27

Now since 27 is divisible by 9 so 456138 will be divisible by 9 too.

By now you must have some idea, how important it is to know these mental maths tricks.Knowing these simple calculation techniques gives you an advantage over others and can get you a job,get you crack any competitive exams and much more.

Multiply any large number by 12 mentally in seconds

To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour

For example 21314 * 12 = 255768

Lets break it into simple steps:

Step 1: 021314 * 12 = _____8 (Double of Last Digit 4= 8 )

Step 2: 021314 * 12 = ____68 (Now Double 1= 2, and add it to 4, 2+4=6)

Step 3: 021314 * 12= ___768 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 1, 6+1=7)

Step 4: 021314 * 12= __5768 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 2+3=5)

Step 5: 021314 * 12= _55768 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 1, 4+1=5)

Step 6: 021314 * 12= 255768 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 2, 0+2=2)

So your final answer of 21314 * 12 = 255768

Another example...

Calculating Square of numbers quickly...

Lets calculate the square of 54

So (54)^2 = 5^2 +4 -- 4^2 = 25 +4 ----16 =29-------16= 2916

Similarly (55)^2 = 5^2 +5 --5^2=25+5------25=30---------25= 3025

Similarly (56)^2 = 5^2 + 6--6^2=25+6------36= 31--------36= 3136 etc..

Similarly try out squares of 57,58 etc..

These are just few of the many Mental Maths Tricks possible. For more Mental Math tricks keep reading this section on regular basis.

- Juniorjunior
- CBSEcbse
- ICSEicse
- Maharashtramaharashtra
- Maharashtra - Marathi Mediummaharashtra - marathi medium
- Gujaratgujarat
- Gujarat - Gujarati Mediumgujarat - gujarati medium
- JEE Foundationjee foundation
- NEET Foundationneet foundation
- Goagoa
- Keralakerala
- Tamil Nadutamil nadu
- Andhra Pradeshandhra pradesh
- Karnatakakarnataka